Lu, Annie (CPSO#: 82947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
143 Metcalfe Street, 2nd Floor
Elora, ON
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Phone: (226) 369-0264
Fax: (226) 369-0246
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annie Lu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lu ( CPSO# 82947 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
143 Metcalfe Street
Elora ON  N0B 1S0

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
235 Union Street
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2007