Lu, Christopher Mark (CPSO#: 93396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Orthopaedic Associates
Unit 200
1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone: (905) 873-8883
Fax: (289) 801-2239
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Mark Lu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lu ( CPSO# 93396 )

Business Address:
200 - 1A Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone Number: (905) 873-8883

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MARK LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2010