Lu, Grant Shao Tsung (CPSO#: 64954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2561
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

90 Larkfield Dr
North York ON  M3B 2H1
Canada
Phone: 416 792-8121
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

104-9497 Mississauga Road
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z8
Canada
Phone: 905 450-5333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

202-9983 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 1S8
Canada
Phone: 905 417-2825
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 104 523 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 1J7
Canada
Phone: 416 252-5437
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

81 Old Kingston Road
Ajax ON  L1T 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 905 428-0020
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

#5-10 Meadowglen Drive
Whitby ON  L1R 3P8
Canada
Phone: 905 579-0709
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

85 King St. East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1N4
Canada
Phone: 905 419-5437
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

875 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4P9
Canada
Phone: 905 529-1251
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Grant Lu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Lu ( CPSO# 64954 )

Business Address:
202 - 9983 Keele Street
Maple ON  L6A 1S8
Phone Number: (905) 417-2825

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology
The Scarborough Hospital, Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2561

Business Address:
3 - 9497 Mississauga Road
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z8
Phone Number: (905) 450-5333

Business Address:
81 Old Kingston Road
Ajax ON  L1T 3A6
Phone Number: (905) 428-0020

Business Address:
104 - 523 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Y 1J7
Phone Number: (416) 252-5437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRANT SHAO TSUNG LU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993