Lu, Meng (CPSO#: 92404)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 07 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2014