Lubanski, Martin Sebastian (CPSO#: 94694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Cardiac Centre
Unit 5
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone: (519) 250-4449
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Martin Sebastian Lubanski may practise medicine independently in cardiology
            excluding invasive cardiology, only.