Lubberdink, Ashley Lauren (CPSO#: 110449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055259140
Electoral District: 04

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Ashley  Lauren Lubberdink shall practise medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate  medical  education  program  in  which  Dr.  Lubberdink  is
                  enrolled at McMaster University.

            (2)   In  Dr. Lubberdink's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program,  Dr.  Lubberdink  shall  prescribe drugs only for in-patients or
                  out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with
                  the department where Dr. Lubberdink  is  properly practising medicine and
                  to which postgraduate trainees are regularly  assigned  by the department
                  as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  Lubberdink's  practice  in  the  postgraduate medical  education
                  program, Dr. Lubberdink shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr.  Lubberdink may practise adult critical  care  medicine  and  to  the
                  extent  of  her  employment   at  Hamilton  Health  Sciences  Corporation
                  Hamilton,  while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Lubberdink's  practice  specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Lubberdink
                  may not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of  registration  expires,  and  Dr.  Lubberdink  must
                  thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical
                  education program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Lubberdink  is  no  longer  enrolled  in  a  program  of
                        postgraduate  medical  education  provided  by  a medical school in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Lubberdink no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a valid employment authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate and Dr.  Lubberdink  must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor  identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Lubberdink's practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns   regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Lubberdink's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval for Dr.  Lubberdink  to  engage  in  practice  outside the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  Lubberdink's  employment  as specified in paragraph  (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Lubberdink takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion  to   a   regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph (7), Dr. Lubberdink may  not  resume  any  practice outside the
                  postgraduate medical education program under the restricted  registration
                  for  residents  policy until Dr. Lubberdink applies for a new certificate
                  of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  July  18,  2018.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a),  this  certificate  of  registration expires on June 30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside  the  postgraduate  medical   education   program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.