Lubelsky, Sari Michelle (CPSO#: 76052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Central Hospital
Department of Pathology
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 7139
Fax: (905) 883-2161
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARI MICHELLE LUBELSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUBELSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 17 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 24 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2007