Lubin, Alexandre Saint-Julien (CPSO#: 81927)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French, Spanish

Education:Autonomous University of Puebla, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2006