Ludwig, Nathan Scott (CPSO#: 95063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Room C3-108
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NS Ludwig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ludwig ( CPSO# 95063 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Room B2424
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8525

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room C3-108
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6S 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN SCOTT LUDWIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUDWIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2017