Lue, Sabrina Rachelle (CPSO#: 103214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
LuQueen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABRINA RACHELLE LUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018