Luginbuehl, Ruth (CPSO#: 78632)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Basel, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003