Lui, Nai Lee (CPSO#: 92300)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2009 to 10 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010