Luketic, Lea (CPSO#: 93082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 James St S
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
2Nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 2G9
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lea Luketic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Luketic ( CPSO# 93082 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Ob/Gyn
301 James Street South
2 Fontbonne Building
Hamilton ON  L8N 2G9
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEA LUKETIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKETIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2015