Lukic, Dusan (CPSO#: 89618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Dept of Pathology and Molecular Med
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35007
Fax: (905) 521-6192
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Dusan Lukic may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  approved  by the Chair, Department of Pathology and
                        Molecular Medicine, McMaster  University,  in which Dr. Lukic holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Lukic no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.