Lukings, Jorin John (CPSO#: 95055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Niagara Family
Health Centre
22 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone: (905) 984-3335
Fax: (905) 984-6008
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jorin Lukings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lukings ( CPSO# 95055 )

Business Address:
McMaster Niagara Family Health Centre
22 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7M3
Phone Number: (905) 984-3335

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORIN JOHN LUKINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013