Lukka, Himanshu Ranchhoddas (CPSO#: 60180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Manchester, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3-207G
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 67698
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Himanshu Lukka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lukka ( CPSO# 60180 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIMANSHU RANCHHODDAS LUKKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990