Luksun, Warren James (CPSO#: 87024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
En 3 448
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.J. Luksun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Luksun ( CPSO# 87024 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
ENJ-448
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN JAMES LUKSUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKSUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2014