Lukwinski, Angelina Tracy (CPSO#: 87044)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
200 Church Street
Weston ON  M9N 1N8
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 04 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 2009