Luong, Me-Linh (CPSO#: 92715)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 May 2010 to 01 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011