Luong, Michael Wing Fai (CPSO#: 95074)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2017 to 27 Oct 2017
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2017