Lusher, Brandon Ezra (CPSO#: 93362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Upstate Medical Center State Univ of N Y, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko General Hospital
PO Box 34
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan ON  L4J 7L2
Canada
Phone: (905) 738-6699
Fax: (905) 738-6073
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brandon Lusher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lusher ( CPSO# 93362 )

Business Address:
800 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L4J 7L2
Phone Number: (905) 738-6699

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
P.O. Box 34
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON EZRA LUSHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUSHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012