Lusty, Christopher Andrew (CPSO#: 96084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 - 920 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4
Phone: 519 5697267
Fax: (866) 264-0876
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lusty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lusty ( CPSO# 96084 )

Business Address:
1 - 920 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW LUSTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUSTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016