Lutchman, Carla Radica (CPSO#: 82791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14-1450 O'Connor Dr
Toronto ON  M4B 2T8
Phone: (416) 699-9035
Fax: (416) 699-9063
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Murray Street
L1-040
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

60 Murray Street
L1-040
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.R. Lutchman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lutchman ( CPSO# 82791 )

Business Address:
Room L1-040
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
1450 O'Connor Drive
Suite 14
Toronto ON  M4B 2T8
Phone Number: (416) 699-9035

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA RADICA LUTCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTCHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012