Luthra, Meera (CPSO#: 76448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building 5th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32739
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meera Luthra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Luthra ( CPSO# 76448 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
F-508
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (416) 522-1155

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA LUTHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005