Luyt, Nathan John Ryan (CPSO#: 86596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: (519) 429-6998
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Johnston and Dr. Luyt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Luyt ( CPSO# 86596 )
Dr. S. Johnston ( CPSO# 86922 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Business Address:
121 Colborne Street South
Simcoe ON  N3Y 4H4
Phone Number: (519) 428-9480

Business Address:
501 St. George Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-1422

Business Address:
167 Ralph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN JOHN RYAN LUYT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUYT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010