Lwu, Shelly Hsu-Hsien (CPSO#: 94179)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2011