Ly, Linh Gia (CPSO#: 78665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 204209
Fax: (416) 813-5245
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINH GIA LY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2002 to 13 Dec 2002
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2003 to 07 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2003 to 14 Nov 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2007 to 31 May 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007