Lynch, Marie-Josee Albert (CPSO#: 91042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing, 9E404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5458
Fax: (416) 603-5912
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Ailon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ailon ( CPSO# 91029 )
Dr. M. Lynch ( CPSO# 91042 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
4-146 Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8251

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-JOSEE ALBERT LYNCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016