Lyster, Kish Everardus (CPSO#: 84065)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kish Lyster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2010