Lysy, Zoe Claire (CPSO#: 89041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zoe Lysy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Lysy ( CPSO# 89041 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6013

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOE CLAIRE LYSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYSY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012