Lyte, Kristina (CPSO#: 93667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building P-210
641 Cambrai Road
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200 Ext. 7122
Fax: (705) 423-7242
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristina Lyte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINA LYTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012