First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |