Hemy, Melissa Dawn (CPSO#: 86777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2226
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA DAWN HEMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009