First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jun 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2022 |