Montalvo, Max (CPSO#: 71490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Gammal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gammal ( CPSO# 70207 )
Dr. M. Montalvo ( CPSO# 71490 )

Business Address:
115 Barrack Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1G2
Phone Number: (613) 549-1440

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 962-7400

Business Address:
Lennox and Addington Country general Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAX MONTALVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTALVO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 03 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003