First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2020 |