First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Mar 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |