Yegappan, Muthulakshmi (CPSO#: 72064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone: (905) 988-6008
Fax: (905) 988-6007
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014


Corporation Name: C. & M. Yegappan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yegappan ( CPSO# 72143 )
Dr. M. Yegappan ( CPSO# 72064 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
140 Niagara Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 4L4
Phone Number: (905) 988-6008

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]

            As  from  October  9, 2012, pursuant to her undertaking with the College, dated
            February 16, 2012,   Dr.  Yegappan has ceased  to practise medicine except with
            respect to her office based  practice  and her practice as a surgical assistant
            to another surgeon on the terms set out  in  her  undertaking  [see (h) below].
            Specifically,  Dr.  Yegappan  will  not  perform any obstetrical deliveries  or
            gynecological surgeries.

            As from February 16, 2012, the following is  imposed  as  a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate  of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Muthulakshmi
            Yegappan,  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.  Yegappan
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            (h)   Pursuant  to  her undertaking with the College, Dr. Yegappan may practice
                  as a surgical assistant only under the direction of a surgeon approved by
                  the College in  a  location  approved by the College, and must inform the
                  College of each and every location where she practices.