M'Cwabeni, Constantine Temba (CPSO#: 60612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Xhosa

Education:University of Birmingham, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 King Street
P O Box 1376
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H6
Phone: (705) 749-9064
Fax: (705) 749-9842
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M'Cwabeni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. M'Cwabeni ( CPSO# 60612 )

Business Address:
PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
150 King Street
P.O. Box 1376
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H4
Phone Number: (705) 749-9064


Corporation Name: Pamela Punungwe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2017


Corporation Name: Pamela Punungwe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Punungwe ( CPSO# 102001)
Dr. C. M'Cwabeni ( CPSO# 60612 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
3607 Hwy 7 East
Markham ON  L6G 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 604-6912

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 747-0066

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
545 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 4W5
Phone Number: (905) 456-8198

Business Address:
P O Box 1376
150 King Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2R9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONSTANTINE TEMBA M'CWABENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. M'CWABENI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1989