Ma, Elaine Frances (CPSO#: 97736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Tree Family Health Centre
Unit 7
730 Front Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Phone: (613) 384-7640
Fax: (613) 634-8595
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: 613-549-6666
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Ma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ma ( CPSO# 97736 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
7 - 730 Front Road
Kingston ON  K7M 6P7
Phone Number: (613) 384-8709

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE FRANCES MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2014