Ma, Karen Minyun (CPSO#: 97760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: Li, Karen Minyun (used until: 25 Jul 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 853-8966
Fax: (905) 853-2953
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 96
550 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Canada
Phone: 905-707-8181
Fax: 905-707-8180
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Ma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ma ( CPSO# 97760 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 853-8966

Business Address:
Suite 96
550 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3Z4
Phone Number: (905) 707-8181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MINYUN MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2014