Ma, Ling Ling (CPSO#: 94673)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Capital University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 22 Dec 2011 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2012