Ma, Martin Tim (CPSO#: 78067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3 Eaton North
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3242
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Ma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Johnson ( CPSO# 82566 )
Dr. M. Ma ( CPSO# 78067 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
3-EN
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3242

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Business Address:
Suite 11 - 15
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1

Business Address:
4-66 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8

Business Address:
1401 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN TIM MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 01 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Feb 2004 to 01 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007