Ma, Stephanie Sue Yee (CPSO#: 89040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Albert Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 3S2
Phone: 519-746-1132
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Ma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ma ( CPSO# 89040 )

Business Address:
50 Albert Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 3S2
Phone Number: (516) 746-1132

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE SUE YEE MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013