Maag, Karla Caroline Owen (CPSO#: 95768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519)941-7575
Fax: (519)941-7060
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karla Maag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Maag ( CPSO# 95768 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARLA CAROLINE OWEN MAAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014