Mabini, Aimee June Verna (CPSO#: 74812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 323
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 815-1704
Fax: (905) 815-1706
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aimee Mabini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mabini ( CPSO# 74812 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
323 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 815-1704

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIMEE JUNE VERNA MABINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MABINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005