MacDonald, Angus Laurie (CPSO#: 26012)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1969 to 14 Jun 1970
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Feb 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015