MacDonald, Blair Dickie Huxter (CPSO#: 91658)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Kingston General Hospital 76 Stuart Street Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Date Received: 27 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2017