MacDonald, Daniel F (CPSO#: 94596)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2014