MacDonald, Ian Andrew Gerald (CPSO#: 74978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7004
Fax: (705) 523-7161
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. MacDonald ( CPSO# 74978 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
9606 - 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN ANDREW GERALD MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2004